judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01724-CV
05-96-01724-CV
11/06/1996
Other Employment
John D. Bomer
Dallas County Historical Foundation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/29/2016Letter issued by the court
05/27/1999Record RetentionDestroy
04/13/1999Mandate Issued
04/13/1999Mandate Issued
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/28/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1998Submitted
10/13/1998Submission
10/13/1998Submitted
08/12/1998Letter Filed
08/10/1998Submission
01/17/1997Brief Filed
01/17/1997Case ready to be set
01/17/1997MattConv
01/17/1997Case ready to be set
12/23/1996Brief Filed
11/26/199650.00 Fee Paid
11/21/1996Record due
11/21/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
11/06/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellee
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/22/1996Appeal Bond Filed
08/23/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/24/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas County Historical FoundAppelleeDiane M. Sumoski
Ms. Hazel Adele Landwehr
Bomer, John D.AppellantJohn E. Wall Jr.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
95-10951-A