judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD J. SHELEST v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0026)
Case Number:S-09-0026Case Docketed On:02/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:RICHARD J. SHELEST v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:RICHARD J. SHELEST, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard J. ShelestDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
James Michael Causey
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 3
Citation:222 P.3d 167

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Richard J. ShelestEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution (District Court)Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
05/06/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/27/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record (two volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/11/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the court. Justice Hill files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Kite joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/19/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
01/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2010Event - Phone Call from call from counsel for Workers' Compensation; does not object to motion for fees and costs.EventPhone CallFinal
02/09/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
02/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/11/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal