judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RASHAUN I. GEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1493
Short Caption:RASHAUN I. GEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-10682-09Filed Date:11/30/2010

Opening Event Date:11/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRashaun I. Gee Y
Paul J. RileyNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ivan M. Waldman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to November 30, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (pii)
12/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (61 pgs/Ott) 9/1/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (212 pgs/Ott) 9/2/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (33 pgs/Ott) 9/3/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (141 pgs/Jeon) 9/7/10 proc. a.m.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (107 pgs/Ott) 9/7/10 proc. p.m.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (217 pgs/Ott) 9/8/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (136 pgs/Ott) 9/10/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (224 pgs/Walker) 9/13/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (225-445 pgs/Walker) 9/14/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (446-678 pgs/Walker) 9/15/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (679-869 pgs/Walker) 9/16/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (869-881 pgs/Walker) 9/17/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (38 pgs/Zamora) 11/16/10 proc. w/cd
02/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/07/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (SEALED pleadings)
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/07/2011RECORD COPIES
03/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 120 days. no oppo
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 9, 2011. (JAC)
08/05/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 10/11/11.
10/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 10, 2011 (Appellee)
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 11/10/11.
11/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/07/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/06/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/08/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Thompson,Belson, Ivan M. Waldman Esq.,for appellant, Nicholas P. Coleman Esq.,for appellee.
10/18/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby,Thompson,Belson) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the appellant's convictions are affirmed.)
10/26/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing and or rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
11/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 12/26/12.
12/20/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
12/28/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Denied
01/28/2013FiledOrder Denying counsel's motion to withdraw (appellant)
01/28/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc
02/01/2013FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Granted
02/01/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/06/2013FiledMandate
02/25/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to appoint new counsel.
05/23/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
06/18/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)