judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF AUGUSTE

Case Information: 33487
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF AUGUSTECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G19700Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/17/1998MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Filed via FAX. 98-00418
12/18/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal. 98-00440
12/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald & Associates--check no. 2437.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00485
12/28/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 98-00532
01/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-00020
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/14/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." The Notice of Settlement Conference issued by the Clerk's Office on January 8, 1999, is moot. 99-00248