judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01325-CV
01-96-01325-CV
11/06/1996
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Altschul, Todd W.
Hon. Ben Hardin, Judge of the 23rd District Court, Brazoria
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/06/1997Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/03/1996Motion for rehearing filed
11/25/1996Opinion issuedOverruled
11/25/1996Opinion issuedOverruled
11/06/1996Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HON. BEN HARDIN, JUDGE OF THERespondentHon. Ben Hardin
Altschul, Todd WarrenRelatorTodd W. Altschul
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Ben Hardin