judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00900-CR
04-96-00900-CR
11/06/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Gary Keith Rogers
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/10/2015Internal memo
02/20/2002Information regarding cause received
09/19/2001Case Returned from Higher Court
07/08/1999Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
07/02/1999Mandate Issued
07/02/1999Mandate Issued
07/01/1999Case Returned from Higher Court
06/29/1999Information regarding cause received
06/22/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
06/17/1999Continuation of Information from previous event
06/17/1999Information regarding cause received
05/26/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/09/1999Continuation of Information from previous event
04/09/1999Continuation of Information from previous event
04/09/1999Letter of Inquiry Filed
03/25/1999Information regarding cause received
03/24/1999Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/23/1999Information regarding cause received
02/18/1999Information regarding cause received
02/16/1999Continuation of Information from previous event
02/16/1999Petition for Review Filed
01/13/1999Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/10/1998Letter of Inquiry Filed
12/07/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
12/07/1998Letter of Inquiry Filed
10/28/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/28/1998Response to Motion Filed
10/27/1998Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/1998Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
10/16/1998Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
09/15/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
09/15/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
09/15/1998Order Entered
09/02/1998Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1998Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1998Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1998Motion to Substitute Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1998Brief Filed
08/31/1998Requests Oral Argument
08/31/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/26/1998Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
08/26/1998Motion Filed
08/20/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/18/1998Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/18/1998Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed
08/05/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/05/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/11/1998Letter of Inquiry Filed
01/29/1998Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
01/15/1998Letter of Inquiry Filed
11/14/1997Affidavit for Motion Filed
10/31/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
10/29/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
10/17/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
10/02/1997Submitted
10/02/1997Submission
10/02/1997Submitted
10/01/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
09/09/1997Submission
08/22/1997Brief Filed
08/22/1997Waives Oral Argument
08/22/1997Case ready to be set
08/22/1997Case ready to be set
08/13/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/23/1997Letter of Inquiry Filed
07/22/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/15/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/24/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1997Brief Filed
06/20/1997Waives Oral Argument
06/16/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/05/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/31/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/31/1997No Description Available.
03/04/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997No Description Available.
01/28/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/28/1997Order Entered
01/17/1997Response to Motion Filed
01/10/1997No Description Available.
01/10/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/10/1997No Description Available.
01/09/1997No Description Available.
12/27/1996No Description Available.
12/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/27/1996Show cause hearing held
12/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/27/1996No Description Available.
12/24/1996No Description Available.
12/24/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/24/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/24/1996No Description Available.
12/20/1996No Description Available.
12/20/1996No Description Available.
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/01/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/27/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
08/30/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/02/1999Case StoredCase stored
07/09/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gary RogersCriminal - AppellantGary Rogers
Gary Keith RogersCriminal - AppellantAlex J. Scharff
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sharon S Macrae
95-CR-6328
50 Years; $10,000.00 Fine.