judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01390-CR
01-96-01390-CR
11/06/1996
Other Felony
Green, Kyle Z.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/12/1996Cause number voided--see remarks on history screenVoid this Court's case number
12/12/1996Cause number voided--see remarks on history screenVoid this Court's case number
11/06/1996Transcript filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/03/1996Record due
09/27/1996Notice of appeal filed
09/04/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/15/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GREEN, KYLE Z.Criminal - AppellantBrian D. Lacour
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasLatham Boone
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Walker
Honorable Erwin Ernst
18900C
7 Yrs. TDC