judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1587-96
PD-1587-96
11/07/1996
PDR Case Type
QUESADA, JOSE LUIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/26/1997REHEAR DISPDENIED
03/26/1997FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
03/26/1997REHEAR DISPDENIED
03/05/1997REHEAR FILED PDR
03/05/1997REHEAR FILED
02/26/1997REHEAR RECEIVED
02/26/1997REHEAR REJECTED
02/19/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/19/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/13/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/07/1996PDR FILED
11/07/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
QUESADA, JOSE LUISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Matthew Dekoatz
STATE OF TEXASStateJaime Esparza
Court of Appeals Information:
08-94-00288-CR
AFF 7-25-96
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso
Honorable MARY ANNE BRAMBLETT
74765