judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00622-CV
03-96-00622-CV
11/06/1996
Negligence tort, other
Gertrude Lambrecht
County of Comal and Jack Bremer, Sheriff of Comal County, Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/27/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/17/1998CASE STORED
07/08/1997Mandate Issued
04/24/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1997ADR mediation referralNo for mediation
04/22/1997Submitted
04/22/1997Submission
03/25/1997Submission
03/13/1997Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
03/10/1997Brief filed
03/10/1997Case ready to be set
02/14/1997Brief filed
02/14/1997Mt file Supp Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1997Staff recommendation for mediationYes for mediation
02/12/1997Mt file Supplemental Record Filed
02/12/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
02/12/1997Supplemental Transcript Received
02/12/1997Docketing statement or response
01/17/1997Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
01/17/1997Motion for remand disposedGranted in part; overruled in part
12/04/1996Response to Motion
12/02/1996Motion for remand filed
11/25/1996Docketing statement or response
11/14/1996ADR letter w/docketing statement
11/13/1996Response requested (postcard)
11/06/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Transcript Received
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/08/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lambrecht, GertrudeAppellantMs. Suzette S. Kinder
County Of ComalAppelleeMs. Ann Clarke Snell
Bremer, Sheriff, Jack Of ComalAppelleeMs. Ann Clarke Snell
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Comal
Honorable B. B. Schraub
C95-712A