judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00626-CV
03-96-00626-CV
11/07/1996
Summary judgment
Kuang-Huei Chen
Sharon Ma, Douglas Ma and Chen Luan Ma
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1999Case stored
06/26/1998Mandate Issued
04/09/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/28/1997miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
10/17/1997Submitted
10/17/1997Submission
10/16/1997miscellaneous motion filed
09/26/1997Submission
09/12/1997Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
09/04/1997Case ready to be set
09/04/1997Brief filed
08/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/30/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/15/1997Brief filed
07/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Brief received, not filed
07/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/24/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/16/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/16/1997Statement of Facts Received
12/12/1996Staff recommendation for mediationNo for mediation
12/10/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/1996Docketing statement or response
12/02/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/22/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1996Docketing statement or response
11/15/1996Affidavit received
11/14/1996ADR letter w/docketing statement
11/14/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/07/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Transcript Received
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/26/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ma, DouglasAppelleeMr. Hubert L. Gill
Ma, SharonAppelleeMr. Hubert L. Gill
Ma, Chen LuanAppelleeMr. Hubert L. Gill
Chen, Kuang-hueiAppellantMr. Bob Mabry
Trial Court Information
147th District Court
Travis
Honorable Margaret A. Cooper
92-12202