judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01369-CR
14-96-01369-CR
11/07/1996
Forgery
Karr, Terrie Lynn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/09/1997Case stored
06/05/1997Mandate due to be issued
06/05/1997Mandate Issued
06/05/1997Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
06/05/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/05/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
06/05/1997Mandate Issued
06/04/1997Submission
06/04/1997Submitted
06/04/1997Case ready to be set
06/02/1997Statement of Facts Due
05/28/1997Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
04/24/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/18/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/17/1997No description available.
04/15/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/13/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/05/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
03/05/1997No description available.
02/28/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/09/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/20/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/20/1996Record due
12/12/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/12/1996Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
12/12/1996Transcript FILED
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/31/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
10/21/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasMichael R. Little
KARR, TERRIE LYNNCriminal - AppellantJames F. Keegan
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
8574
10 Years TDCJ