judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1091
96-1091
11/07/1996
Granted cause that originated w/130(d) mo/2 apps.
J. HUDSON SCHLUETER and RICHARD STEPHEN SCHLUETER
KAREN SUE SCHLUETER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/20/1998Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filed
10/07/1997Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent1 strung exhibit
04/18/1997Supplemental Brief filedRespondentKaren S. Schlueter's supplemental brief in reply to Richard's Supplemental brief in support of Richard's points of error one and two
04/02/1997Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerOn behalf of Richard Schlueter / supp br. in support of appSequence #: 01
01/17/1997Reply to ResponseRespondentIn response to both App's
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Richard Stephen SchlueterSequence #: 01
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of J. Hudson SchlueterSequence #: 02
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/23/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
12/23/1998Mandate issuedcase stored
10/15/1998Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledrehearing overruled
07/20/1998Motion for Rehearing
07/20/1998Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
07/03/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed in part; remanded to trial courtCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
07/03/1998Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordjudgment issued
07/03/1998Dissenting opinion issued.Dissenting opinion by NLH joined by TRP.
07/03/1998Dissenting opinion issued.Dissenting opinion by RS.
07/03/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed in part; remanded to trial courtCA judgment is affirmed/part, reversed/part & cause is remanded in part to TC. Opin. by RAG w/CTE, PRO, JAB, GA, DGH. 975 SW2d 584
07/03/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed in part; remanded to trial courtCA judgment is affirmed/part, reversed/part & cause is remanded in part to TC. Opin. by RAG w/CTE, PRO, JAB, GA, DGH. 975 SW2d 584
07/03/1998Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed in part; remanded to trial courtCA judgment is affirmed/part, reversed/part & cause is remanded in part to TC. Opin. by RAG w/CTE, PRO, JAB, GA, DGH. 975 SW2d 584
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
10/07/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
10/07/1997Exhibits in case/cause filed1 strung exhibit
10/07/1997Oral argument Argued for pet by Mr. Thomas M. Alvis and Mr. Philip C. Friday, Jr. Argued for resp by Mr. John F. Campbell and Mr. Mark W. Clemens
06/06/1997Set for Submissionto be Argued 7 October, 1997
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/18/1997Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20 minutes to argue
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedApplication on behalf of J. Hudson Schlueter is granted "Because." Submission date not set at this time
04/18/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedApplication on behalf of Richard S. Schlueter is granted on Pts. 1, 2, 3, 4 & 5; this cause is not set for submission at this time.
04/18/1997Supplemental Brief filedKaren S. Schlueter's supplemental brief in reply to Richard's Supplemental brief in support of Richard's points of error one and two
04/18/1997Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
04/02/1997Supplemental Brief filedOn behalf of Richard Schlueter / supp br. in support of appSequence #: 01
01/22/1997Case forwarded to Court
01/17/1997Reply to ResponseIn response to both App's
12/31/1996MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedreply due 01-17-97
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Richard Stephen SchlueterSequence #: 01
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of J. Hudson SchlueterSequence #: 02
11/12/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedJ. Hudson Schlueter's 130(d) granted to and including 9 December, 1996Sequence #: 02
11/08/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filedon behalf of J. Hudson Schlueter'sSequence #: 02
11/07/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDApplication due in the COA on or before 9 December, 1996Sequence #: 02
11/07/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 12-09-96Sequence #: 01
11/07/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 12-09-96Sequence #: 01
11/07/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filedon behalf of Richard Stephen SchlueterSequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/23/1998Case StoredCase stored.17-C-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SCHLUETER, J. HUDSONPetitionerMr. Thomas M. Alvis
SCHLUETER, KAREN SUERespondentMr. Mark W. Clemens
Mr. John F. Campbell
SCHLUETER, RICHARD STEPHENPetitionerMr. Philip C. Friday Jr.
Ms. Kristen A. Algert
Court of Appeals Information:
03-95-00294-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
929 SW2d 094, 08-28-96
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable JIMMY CARROLL
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable Mary Pearl Williams
93-07612