judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1090
96-1090
11/07/1996
App Writ Err (2) Originally filed as 130(d)
H. ROGER LAWLER
COLLIN COUNTY/COLLIN COUNTY CCD FRISCO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT CITY OF PLANO/PLANO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT and McKINNEY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/24/1997Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Collin County, et al.Sequence #: 02
01/15/1997Reply to ResponseRespondentLawler's reply to application of Collin County, et al.Sequence #: 01
12/02/1996Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of Collin County/Collin County CCD ET AL
12/02/1996Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of McKinney ISD
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of H. Roger LawlerSequence #: 01
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/21/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
03/21/1997Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledMotion to disregard response to application for writ of error is overruled
03/21/1997Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledSecond motion to disregard response to application for writ of error is overruled
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedon behalf of H. Rogert LawlerSequence #: 01
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedon behalf of Collin County, et al.Sequence #: 02
01/24/1997Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Collin County, et al.Sequence #: 02
01/15/1997Notice requesting filing feereply ($5.00); to Henry E. KerrySequence #: 01
01/15/1997Reply to ResponseLawler's reply to application of Collin County, et al.Sequence #: 01
12/11/1996Reply to Response to MotionCollin County et al.'s reply to motion to disregard replySequence #: 02
12/09/1996Miscellaneous MotionSecond motion to disregard the response to application
12/02/1996Miscellaneous MotionLawler's motion to disregard response
12/02/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDCollin County, et al.'s app due 12-31-96Sequence #: 02
12/02/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedCollin County/Collin County Community College District, et al.'s app due 12-31-96Sequence #: 02
12/02/1996Notice requesting filing feeMiscellaneous motion ($10.00) to Henry E. Kerry
12/02/1996Reply to Responseon behalf of McKinney ISD
12/02/1996Reply to Responseon behalf of Collin County/Collin County CCD ET AL
11/26/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/25/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filedon behalf of Collin County/Collin County Community College District et al. Orig. + 1 Fwd.Sequence #: 02
11/25/1996Notice of AppearanceMr. Harold D. Hammett for McKinney ISD
11/18/1996Document filed (see remarks)Judgment from COA (orders attached showing mo/res being overruled)
11/14/1996Document received (See Remarks)Notice from 5th Court of appeals that BOTH motions for rehearing were disposed of on August 26, 1996; Letter from Henry Kerry attached
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of H. Roger LawlerSequence #: 01
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F2 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COLLIN COUNTYRespondentMs. Sydna H. Gordon
FRISCO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRespondentMr. Lewis L. Isaacks
COLLIN COUNTY CCDRespondentMs. Sydna H. Gordon
LAWLER, ROGER H.PetitionerMs. Grace Forderhase
Honorable Nancy L. Berger
Mr. Henry E. Kerry
CITY OF PLANORespondentMr. David B. McCall
MCKINNEY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DIRespondentMr. Henry Steen Jr.
Mr. Harold D. Hammett
PLANO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRespondentMr. David B. McCall
MCKINNEY INDEPENDENT SCHOOLRespondentMr. Gerard M. Palomo
Court of Appeals Information:
05-95-00487-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Rem'd
RULE 90, 07-12-96
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable TOM JAMES
Trial Court Information
219th District Court
Collin
Honorable Curt B. Henderson
219-170-93