judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00903-CR
04-96-00903-CR
11/07/1996
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte Duval Lance Phelps
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/1997Mandate received by the trial court
04/14/1997Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
02/05/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/05/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1997Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Motion Filed
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997Motion for Leave Filed
12/18/1996Order Entered
12/10/1996Motion Filed
12/03/1996Requests Oral Argument
12/03/1996Brief Filed
11/07/1996No Description Available.
11/07/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/07/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/07/1996No Description Available.
11/07/1996No Description Available.
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/30/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/30/1996Appealable Order signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ex Parte Duval Lance PhelpsCriminal - AppellantHonorable Emil Karl Prohl
Joe Mike Egan, Jr.
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasRonald L. Sutton
Trial Court Information
198th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable Emil Karl Prohl
B96-72