judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00902-CR
04-96-00902-CR
11/07/1996
Burglary
Alvin C. Robertson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1997Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
09/25/1997Mandate Issued
09/25/1997Mandate Issued
09/24/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
09/24/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
08/29/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
08/29/1997Motion Filed
08/19/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
08/13/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/29/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/16/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/16/1997No Description Available.
06/16/1997Exhibits Filed
05/14/1997Motion to Substitute Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1997Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed
04/29/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/24/1997No Description Available.
03/10/1997No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
03/05/1997No Description Available.
02/28/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
02/18/1997No Description Available.
02/18/1997No Description Available.
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/04/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
11/04/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/22/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1997Case StoredCase stored
09/25/2022RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alvin C. RobertsonCriminal - AppellantEduardo J. Garcia
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasSteven C. Hilbig
Alvin G. RobertsonCriminal - AppellantRaymond E. Fuchs
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raymond Angelini
95-CR-5861
Suspended on 10/24/96 for