judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00621-CR
03-96-00621-CR
11/07/1996
Sexual Assault
Harry Riley
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
08/03/1998Mandate Acknowledgment
07/22/1998Mandate Issued
07/20/1998Case returned from higher court
06/24/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtRefused
05/01/1998Case forwarded to higher court
04/28/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
03/23/1998Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/1998Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
11/13/1997Submitted
11/13/1997Submission
10/29/1997Oral argument acknowledged
10/28/1997Oral argument acknowledged
10/22/1997Submission
08/06/1997Brief filed
08/06/1997Case ready to be set
07/03/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/04/1997Brief filed
05/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/11/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/13/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/06/1997Exhibits filed
02/06/1997Statement of Facts Filed
11/08/1996Ext. to file s/facts filed and disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/07/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/07/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/22/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. C. Bryan Case Jr.
The Honorable Ronald Earle
Riley, HarryAppellantMr. Erik S. Goodman
Mr. Ian Inglis
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable L. L. Fuller
0941986
15 1/2 yrs.