judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00554-CR
13-96-00554-CR
11/07/1996
Assault & battery
Ramirez, Joel Gandaria
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1998Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
07/14/1998Mandate Issued
04/09/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1997Submitted
10/02/1997Submission
09/23/1997Waiver Filed
09/08/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
09/08/1997Submission
08/28/1997Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/20/1997Brief Filed
08/20/1997Brief received.
08/20/1997Motion for leave to file brief
08/20/1997No oral argument requested
07/17/1997Motion to File Motion ________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Motion for Leave to File Motion _______
07/03/1997Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
06/23/1997Motion for leave to file brief
06/19/1997Brief Filed
06/19/1997Case ready to be set
06/19/1997Brief received.
06/19/1997Oral argument requested
05/05/1997Green card in
04/30/1997Order Entered
04/30/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/22/1997Additional copies of motion for extension of time
04/21/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/15/199710 day letter sent
04/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/16/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/19/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/19/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
12/19/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDavid W. Hartmann
Yolanda De Leon
Ramirez, Joel GandariaAppellantHon. Larry Warner
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable James B. Zimmermann
96-CR-695-D
35 yrs TDCJ/ID