judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00555-CV
13-96-00555-CV
11/07/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Cassidy, Janice A.
Rogers, Ron
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/1997Cite for opinions
06/10/1997Mandate Issued
04/24/1997Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
01/23/1997Submitted
01/23/1997Submission
01/09/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/09/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/09/1997Submission
12/16/1996Brief Filed
12/16/1996Oral argument requested
12/13/1996Affidavit Filed
12/11/1996Information requested by the court
12/02/1996Miscellaneous Motion
11/27/1996Case ready to be set
11/27/1996Oral argument requested
11/27/1996Brief Filed
11/19/1996Statement Filed
11/14/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/14/1996Statement Filed
11/07/1996Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Transcript Received
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rogers, RonAppelleeRaymond L. Gill
Cassidy, Janice A.AppellantHon. Janice A. Cassidy
Trial Court Information
197th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Darrell Hester
95-05-2213-C