judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00389-CV
07-96-00389-CV
11/07/1996
Mandamus
Levario, Fernando, Relator
Cannon, Thomas, Judge, Lubbock County Court at Law, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/17/1998Mandate Issued
11/24/1997Opinion issuedGRANT
11/05/1997Submitted
11/05/1997Submission
10/23/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
10/10/1997Submission
11/20/1996Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed
11/20/1996Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)GRANT
11/18/1996Response to any order, inquiry or motion
11/07/1996Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/17/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Levario, Fernando RelatorAppellantTravis Sandoval
Fox, GlennAppelleeBrian P. Heinrich
Trial Court Information
Honorable Patrick A. Pirtle