judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-96-00095-CV
06-96-00095-CV
11/07/1996
Mandamus/prohibition
Aaron L. Stuart
The Honorable Bill Peek, Judge, 202nd Judicial District Court, Bowie County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/03/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/10/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/05/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/19/1996Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1996Motion to File DispOverruled
11/19/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
11/12/1996Motion to Dismiss Appeal
11/08/1996Holding for Record
11/07/1996Motion for leave to file
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Bill Peek, RespondentAppelleeHon. Bill Peek
Aaron L. Stuart, RelatorAppellantAaron L. Stuart
Trial Court Information
Honorable Alvin G. Khoury