judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00390-CR
07-96-00390-CR
11/07/1996
Other Felony
Garner, Tyrone Deshan
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1998Mandate Issued
10/23/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1997Submitted
10/06/1997Submission
09/12/1997Submission
08/07/1997Case reinstated
08/07/1997Do not use
08/07/1997Case reinstated
07/28/1997Mandate Issued
07/28/1997Opinion issuedAbated
07/28/1997Submitted
07/28/1997Submission
07/14/1997Do not use
05/01/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
04/30/1997Brief Filed
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/02/1997Brief Filed
03/28/1997Do not use
03/28/1997Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
03/17/1997Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
03/04/1997Do not use
03/04/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/03/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/03/1997Do not use
01/31/1997Do not use
11/07/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Garner, Tyrone DeshanCriminal - AppellantSara F. Moore
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock
96-422,711
99 yrs, TDC