judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00302-CV
02-96-00302-CV
11/06/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Khatib, Ilham and Farouk Khatib
Husain, M.D., Tehmina; Asif Husain, M.D.; Miguel R. Alday, M.D.; and Consultants in Radiology, P.A.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/29/1998Mandate Issued
03/13/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
03/13/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1997Order Entered
10/06/1997Mandate Issued
08/21/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/01/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/17/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Remanded in Part
06/18/1997Submitted
06/18/1997Submission
04/30/1997Brief Filed
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/25/1997Brief Filed
03/31/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/21/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/03/1997Brief Filed
01/30/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/27/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/12/1996Submission
12/02/1996No Description Available.
11/13/1996Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/1996Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Khatib, IlhamAppellantMike Felber
Alday, M.D., Miguel R.AppelleeJ. M. Lee
Husain, M.D., AsifAppelleeJonathan D.F. Nelson
Khatib, FaroukAppellantMike Felber
Husain, M.D., TehminaAppelleeJonathan D.F. Nelson
Consultants In Radiology P.a.AppelleeJ. M. Lee
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John Robert McCoy
48-156439-94