judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1084
96-1084
11/07/1996
App Writ of Error
TERRY MAHLEN
MARK SENFT D.P.M.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/11/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Paul A. Tucker, 1100 Leeland St., Houston, TX 77002 713/659-7431
06/11/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondentSenft's reply to amicus of Peter M. Blute, Jerry Holmes & G. Allen Price
06/11/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefRespondentSenft's reply to amicus of Sam Yates, Jr.
06/04/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)by Pat Maloney, Sr. @ 239 E. Commerce Street, San Antonio TX 78205 (210)226-8888
05/30/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Sam Yates, Jr., 952 Echo Lane, Suite 465, Houston, TX 77042 713/952-0220
05/20/1997Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerpetitioner's supplemental brief on rehearing
05/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Allen Price, 820 South Gessner, Suite 1340, Houston, TX 77024 713/783-2211
05/14/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Jerry Holmes @ P.O. Drawer 1026, Nederland TX 77627 (409)721-5400
05/14/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Peter Blute, 11601 Katy Freeway, Suite 101, Houston, TX 77079 713/496-0555
04/21/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondenton behalf of Dr. Mark Senft
04/10/1997Motion for RehearingPetitionerpostmark attached to original
11/27/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/31/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
06/12/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/12/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledas supplemented
06/12/1997Petition to S.Ct. to publish C.A. opinion disposedDenied
06/11/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Paul A. Tucker, 1100 Leeland St., Houston, TX 77002 713/659-7431
06/11/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefSenft's reply to amicus of Peter M. Blute, Jerry Holmes & G. Allen Price
06/11/1997Reply to Amicus Curiae BriefSenft's reply to amicus of Sam Yates, Jr.
06/04/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedby Pat Maloney, Sr. @ 239 E. Commerce Street, San Antonio TX 78205 (210)226-8888
05/30/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Sam Yates, Jr., 952 Echo Lane, Suite 465, Houston, TX 77042 713/952-0220
05/27/1997Notice requesting filing fee$75.00 fee for 90C not paid letter sent to John Holloway
05/27/1997Petition to publish CA opinion under TRAP 90(c)"Petition of Terry Mahlen to order the court of appeals opinion published"
05/20/1997Supplemental Brief filedpetitioner's supplemental brief on rehearing
05/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Allen Price, 820 South Gessner, Suite 1340, Houston, TX 77024 713/783-2211
05/14/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Jerry Holmes @ P.O. Drawer 1026, Nederland TX 77627 (409)721-5400
05/14/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Peter Blute, 11601 Katy Freeway, Suite 101, Houston, TX 77079 713/496-0555
05/13/1997Call receivedfrom Atty Holloway that two amicus brief's will be delivered to the Court rega rding his Mo/Re and that the Court should receive them by overnight mail.
04/21/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedon behalf of Dr. Mark Senft
04/10/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/10/1997Motion for Rehearingpostmark attached to original
04/10/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
03/27/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/27/1996Reply to Response
11/26/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/07/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/07/1996Brief filed that is difficult to read due to colorCLEAR COVERS ON APP (to John H. Holloway)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/31/1997Case StoredCase stored.27A4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MAHLEN, TERRYAppellantMr. John H. Holloway
SENFT, D.P.M., MARKAppelleeMr. Todd J. Broussard
Mr. John C. Marshall III
SENFT, D.P.M., MARKRespondentMr. John C. Marshall III
Mr. Todd J. Broussard
MAHLEN, TERRYPetitionerMr. John H. Holloway
Court of Appeals Information:
14-95-00303-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-18-96
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable LESLIE BROCK YATES
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
Honorable Don E. Wittig
92-02050