Case: 02-96-00311-CV
02-96-00311-CV
11/12/1996
Other Personal Injury
HealthSouth Corporation d/b/a HealthSouth Rehabilitation Hospital
Love, Linda, Individually and as Legal Representative of the Estate of Minnie Viola Wilson
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/25/2009 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/14/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/29/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/29/1997 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
05/28/1997 | Submitted | | |
05/28/1997 | Submission | | |
05/08/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
03/21/1997 | Letter | | |
01/24/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/23/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
12/31/1996 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/20/1996 | Exhibits Filed | | |
12/20/1996 | Letter | | |
12/20/1996 | Motion Filed | | |
12/20/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
12/20/1996 | Other Document Filed | | |
11/20/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
11/20/1996 | Submission | | |
11/12/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
11/12/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
11/12/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/25/2009 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Minnie VIola Estate | Appellee | David E. Keltner Brandon L. Boehme |
Healthsouth Corporation D/b/a | Appellant | P. Michael Jung |
Love, Linda | Appellee | Brandon L. Boehme David E. Keltner |
Healthsouth Rehabilitation Hos | Appellant | P. Michael Jung |
Trial Court Information
96th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Harry Hopkins
96-160043-95