judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00515-CR
02-96-00515-CR
11/12/1996
All Misdemeanors
Swafford, Kenneth Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/02/1999Mandate Issued
02/03/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
11/02/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
10/09/1998Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/14/1997Submitted
10/14/1997Submission
10/10/1997Letter
10/01/1997Letter
09/18/1997Letter
07/29/1997Letter
05/15/1997Brief Filed
05/15/1997Case ready to be set
04/04/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/01/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/16/1997Submission
01/13/1997Brief Filed
11/12/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/02/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBruce Isaacks
Swafford, Kenneth LeeCriminal - AppellantJ.E. Brownlee
David Chapman
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 2
Denton
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
CR-93-07773-B
365daysjail/prob.2yrs$800f