judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00516-CR
02-96-00516-CR
11/12/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Denstitt, Jr., Henry John
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1997Mandate Issued
10/09/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/10/1997Submitted
06/10/1997Submission
06/09/1997Letter
03/12/1997Brief Filed
03/12/1997Case ready to be set
01/21/1997Submission
01/13/1997Brief Filed
11/12/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Cole
Denstitt, Jr., Henry JohnCriminal - AppellantHon. Jack A. McGaughey
Trial Court Information
97th District Court
Montague
Honorable Roger E. Towery
94-08-0050M-CR
25 yrs IDTDCJ