judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00350-CV
09-96-00350-CV
11/12/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Williams, Cynthia Jean
Sadler Development Corporation d/b/a Annie's Country Store
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1998Mandate Issued
10/27/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
08/13/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1998Submitted
02/26/1998Submission
12/16/1997Submission
04/11/1997Brief Filed
04/11/1997Case ready to be set
03/17/1997Brief Filed
02/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/09/1996mediation form received from attorney
11/25/1996Transcript Filed
11/15/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/27/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Williams, Cynthia JeanAppellantJohn Gano
Stephen M. Gano
Annie`s Country StoreAppelleeAnthony Icenogle
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable John C Martin
95-03-00884 CV