judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00351-CR
09-96-00351-CR
11/12/1996
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Robinson, Drew Wayne
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
09/21/1998Mandate Issued
07/08/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/02/1998Submitted
04/02/1998Submission
02/11/1998Submission
06/26/1997Brief Filed
06/26/1997Case ready to be set
05/20/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/31/1997Brief Filed
01/29/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/23/1997Letter
12/17/1996Transcript Filed
12/13/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/12/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/12/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robinson, Drew WayneAppellantCraig A. Washington
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn S. Holleman
William Lee Hon
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Polk
Honorable Joe Ned Dean
14114
18 years