judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01371-CR
14-96-01371-CR
11/12/1996
Other Felony
Montoya, Ruben
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/1998Case stored
05/29/1998Mandate due to be issued
05/29/1998Mandate Issued
05/29/1998Mandate Issued
05/04/1998No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/04/1998Petition for discretionary review due
04/17/1998Motion for rehearing DUE
04/17/1998No motion for rehearing FILED
04/02/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/02/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/01/1998Submitted
04/01/1998Submission
04/01/1998Submitted
02/28/1997State's brief DUE
02/25/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/25/1997Case ready to be set
02/25/1997Case ready to be set
02/03/1997Appellant's brief DUE
01/31/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/06/1997Record due
01/06/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/03/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/03/1997Transcript FILED
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/06/1996Date of Sentence
11/06/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1998Case StoredCase stored
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasS. Elaine Roch
MONTOYA, RUBENCriminal - AppellantBlair Davis
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM T. HARMON
729,034
5 Years TDCJ