judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID CRUM V. HARCO, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1489
Short Caption:DAVID CRUM V. HARCO, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6174-10Filed Date:11/29/2010

Opening Event Date:11/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Crum YPro SeN
AppelleeHarco Inc.N
Stephen J. O'BrienNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 29, 2010_, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/21/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/19/10) (elp)
01/11/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/ documents attached
01/11/2011RECEIVED- aplt's docuements to be supplemented
01/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (22-pgs/tape 11/19/10 proc.)w/cd
01/21/2011RECORD INDEX
01/21/2011RECORD COPIES
01/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to supplement the record, and it appearing that appellant seeks to supplement the record on appeal with documents that were not part of the record in the underlying matter in the trial court, and it further appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the motion to supplement the record is denied. See D.C. App. R. 10 (a); Cobb v. Standard Drug Co., 453 A.2d 110, 112 (D.C. 1982). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (ETW) elp
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached
03/09/2011APPENDIX
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/20/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
07/01/2011JMT GRANT APPELLEE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
07/01/2011AFFIRMED (GLRDTE)