judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT ALLAN SWEET v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0021)
Case Number:S-09-0021Case Docketed On:01/28/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ROBERT ALLAN SWEET v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROBERT ALLAN SWEET, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Allan SweetDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 87
Citation:234 P.3d 1193

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant; and Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/26/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Exhibits & Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for (undated) by agent for Warden at Wyoming Honor Farm.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/15/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/04/2010Event - Phone Call - Received call from Sue O'Brien at the AG's office. Warden never received copy of mandate. Green certified card was never returned. Tracked the certified mail and printed report and put in file. It appears notice was left on July 17, 2010 at 1:34 pm in Lander? Resent by certified mail today.EventPhone CallFinal
08/06/2010Service - Mail returned - Received original certified mandate back. They were trying to serve on the Wardens residence on the property and house was vacant.ServiceMail returnedFinal
08/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card sent to WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal