judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00334-CR
12-96-00334-CR
11/12/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Greenhaw, Raymond Hollis, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1999
06/24/1999Case stored
06/24/1999Mandate Issued
06/08/1999Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/28/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/12/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/22/1999ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
04/16/1999Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/26/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/05/1999Letter from the Court
01/26/1999Recalling mandate on own motion
12/30/1998Letter from the Court
12/28/1998Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1998letter received
12/28/1998Mandate Issued
12/02/1998Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
03/30/1998
03/27/1998letter received
03/24/1998Mandate Issued
03/11/1998Notice Filed
03/09/1998letter received
02/27/1998letter received
02/24/1998Petition for discretionary review was not filed
02/19/1998Motion to Withdraw Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/20/1998Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed
12/09/1997motion for rehearing filed
11/26/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1997Submitted
11/13/1997Submission
10/17/1997Submission
06/27/1997Letter from the Court
04/29/1997Prescreened
04/28/1997Brief Filed
04/28/1997Case ready to be set
03/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/14/1997Brief Filed
01/27/1997
01/23/1997Motion or Writ Granted
01/07/1997motion for extension of time to file sfacts
01/03/1997
12/31/1996affidavit filed
12/30/1996
12/30/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/04/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/20/1996Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
08/30/1996Date Sentence Given in Open Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/24/1999Case StoredCase stored
06/24/1999RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMs. Donna R. Bennett
Greenhaw, Jr., Raymond HollisCriminal - AppellantMr. Barry E. Bilger
Raymond Greenhaw, Jr.
Trial Court Information
173rd District Court
Henderson
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
A-8179
30 yrs TDCJ-ID