judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00332-CR
12-96-00332-CR
11/12/1996
Theft
Depue, Julie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/1997ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
07/17/1997Case stored
07/14/1997Mandate Issued
05/30/1997Petition for discretionary review was not filed
05/15/1997Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/30/1997
04/30/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/14/1997supplemental transcript filed
04/07/1997Findings of Facts filed in Trial Court
01/15/1997Order Entered
01/10/1997letter filed
01/03/1997
12/16/1996
12/04/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/17/1996Date Sentence Given in Open Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2022RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
07/17/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Edward J. Marty
Depue, JulieCriminal - AppellantJulie Depue
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
116,998-A
140 days SCJ & costs