judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01763-CV
05-96-01763-CV
11/12/1996
Juvenile
In The Matter of M.D.J.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
06/05/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/18/2015Letter issued by the court
05/24/1999Record RetentionDestroy
03/08/1999Mandate Issued
03/08/1999Mandate Issued
12/08/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/08/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/28/1998Submitted
10/28/1998Submission
10/28/1998Submitted
10/02/1998Brief Due
09/11/1998Brief Due
09/02/1998Letter Filed
08/25/1998Submission
08/24/1998Letter Sent by the Court
08/21/1998Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed
08/20/1998Corrected Judgment Entered
08/11/1998Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed
08/04/1998Response to Motion
08/03/1998Letter Sent by the Court
08/03/1998Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed
07/31/1998Letter Filed
07/31/1998Response due
07/23/1998Letter Sent by the Court
07/20/1998Letter Filed
04/27/1998Letter Sent by the Court
02/04/1998Order EnteredAbated
12/30/1997Letter Filed
12/15/1997Submission
04/05/1997MattConv
03/31/1997Brief Filed
03/31/1997Case ready to be set
03/31/1997Case ready to be set
03/26/1997Extension of Time to File Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/26/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/26/1997Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/26/1997Order EnteredStrike
02/21/1997Brief Filed
02/11/1997Motion for Extension to File Amended Brief
02/08/1997MattConv
02/07/1997MattConv
01/31/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/31/1997Motion to Abate Filed
01/29/1997Letter Sent by the Court
01/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1997MattConv
01/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/12/1996MattConv
11/12/1996Record due
11/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/13/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
09/11/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasAppelleeApril E. Smith
In The Matter Of M.j.AppellantGabriel Chima Ogueri
Trial Court Information
305th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Cheryl C Lee-shannon
JD-30620-X