judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01394-CR
01-96-01394-CR
11/12/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Nolasco, Irene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/20/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/14/1999Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/16/1999Motion for Rehearing Due
04/01/1999Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/01/1999Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/28/1998Submitted
07/28/1998Submission
07/28/1998Submitted
07/01/1998Submission
08/22/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/22/1997Case ready to be set
08/22/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/22/1997Case ready to be set
08/15/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/07/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/30/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/10/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/02/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/12/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/27/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/26/1997Brief Due
05/04/1997Brief Due
05/01/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/03/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
04/03/1997Statement of facts filed
03/20/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/27/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/24/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/23/1997Brief Due
02/21/1997Court correspondence to parties/letter in file
02/20/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/09/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/19/1996Brief Due
12/18/1996Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/19/1996Statement of facts filed
11/13/1996Transcript filed
11/12/1996Record due
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/14/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
07/30/1996Notice of appeal filed
07/15/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
NOLASCO, IRENECriminal - AppellantStephen A. Gustitis
Richard W. Davis
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Douglas Howell, III
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JOHN M. DELANEY
24189272
Life TDC 5,000 Fine