judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00557-CR
13-96-00557-CR
11/12/1996
Capital Murder
Ramos, Julian
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/1998Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
04/03/1998Mandate Issued
01/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1997Submitted
06/05/1997Submission
06/04/1997Oral argument waived
05/08/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
05/08/1997Submission
02/18/1997Brief Filed
02/18/1997No oral argument requested
01/16/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/31/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1996Brief Filed
12/13/1996Case ready to be set
12/13/1996Oral argument requested
11/19/1996Transcript Filed
11/15/1996STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/12/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ramos, JulianAppellantHon. John S. Gilmore Jr.
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBarrett W. Phillips
Thomas L. Bridges
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Joel Ballard Johnson
S-96-3161CR