judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00910-CV
04-96-00910-CV
11/12/1996
Juvenile
In The Matter of C.H., A Juvenile
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/03/1997Mandate Issued
10/03/1997Mandate Issued
07/31/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/31/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/04/1997Submitted
06/04/1997Submission
06/04/1997Submitted
05/02/1997Submission
04/24/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
03/31/1997Brief Filed
03/31/1997Waives Oral Argument
03/31/1997Case ready to be set
03/31/1997Case ready to be set
03/24/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/21/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/16/1997Brief Filed
01/16/1997Requests Oral Argument
12/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/27/1996Order Entered
12/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/12/1996No Description Available.
12/11/1996Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1996Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/10/1996Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
12/02/1996Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
12/02/1996Motion Filed
11/18/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/18/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/18/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/18/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/18/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/18/1996Show cause hearing held
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/23/1996No Description Available.
10/23/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/23/1996No Description Available.
10/10/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
08/02/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
07/12/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
01/27/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/03/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeEdward F. Shaughnessy, III
In The Matter Of C.h., A JuvenAppellantLaura D. Heard
Trial Court Information
289th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carmen Kelsey
94-JUV-00153
unknown at this time.