judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00393-CR
07-96-00393-CR
11/12/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Williams, Paul Ervin, III
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/06/2002Case returned from Attorney General
03/21/2002Case forwarded to Attorney General
11/27/2000Mandate Issued
11/15/2000Case Returned from Higher Court
10/04/2000Petition for Discretionary Review Refused
08/03/2000Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/14/2000Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
04/19/2000Extension filed with CCAGRANT
05/13/1998Mandate Issued
02/26/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1998Submitted
02/09/1998Submission
01/16/1998Submission
12/18/1997Motion to Postpone Submissions DisposedGRANT
12/17/1997Motion to Postpone Submissions Filed
12/12/1997Submission
10/07/1997Brief Filed
10/07/1997Case ready to be set
10/06/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
10/06/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
10/03/1997Response to any order, inquiry or motion
10/02/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/02/1997Case ready to be set
09/02/1997Brief Filed
08/25/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
08/13/1997Do not use
07/03/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/01/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/01/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/01/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/28/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
02/26/1997Do not use
02/26/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
02/05/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
02/05/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/02/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
11/26/1996Do not use
11/25/1996Mot. to extend time to file notice of appeal filedGRANT
11/12/1996Mot. to extend time to file notice of appeal disp
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWade Jackson
Williams, III, Paul ErwinCriminal - AppellantPaul Erwin Williams III
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
94-419,438
50 yrs, TDC