judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01764-CV
05-96-01764-CV
11/12/1996
Damages
Gabriel Camacho
Monico Villareal
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
12/21/2016Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
12/09/2016Letter issued by the court
06/01/1999Record RetentionDestroy
05/28/1999Mandate Issued
05/28/1999Mandate Issued
03/31/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/31/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1999Submitted
02/10/1999Submission
02/10/1999Submitted
11/10/1998Submission
05/06/1997MattConv
04/25/1997Brief Filed
04/25/1997Case ready to be set
04/25/1997Case ready to be set
04/18/1997MattConv
04/11/1997Brief Received
03/29/1997MattConv
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/20/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1997MattConv
02/19/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/07/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/04/1997MattConv
01/28/1997Exhibits Filed
01/28/1997Statement of Facts Filed
12/12/1996MattConv
12/06/1996Record due
12/05/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/26/1996Motion to Withdraw Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996MattConv
11/22/1996Response due
11/21/199650.00 Fee Paid
11/21/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/14/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
11/12/1996Motion to Withdraw Attorney
11/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/31/1996Appeal Bond Filed
08/27/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
08/06/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Camacho, GabrielAppellantChristian T. Souza
Monico, VIllarealAppelleeCharles W. McGarry
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
CC-95-00635-D