judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00631-CR
03-96-00631-CR
11/12/1996
STATE APPEAL
The State of Texas
Tommy Wayne Butterfield
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1998Case stored
03/11/1997Mandate Acknowledgment
02/25/1997Mandate Issued
12/19/1996Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
11/19/1996Statement of facts overdue
11/19/1996Transcript filed/no order
11/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Butterfield, Tommy Wayne E/pAppelleeMr. Kirk W. Tate
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasAppellantThe Honorable Ronald Earle
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable Bob Perkins
0961962