judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00395-CR
07-96-00395-CR
11/12/1996
Burglary
Young, Lynn Dale
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2000Case returned from Attorney General
07/28/1999Case forwarded to Attorney General
06/16/1997Mandate Issued
04/29/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1997Submitted
04/29/1997Submission
04/02/1997Case ready to be set
01/24/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/21/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/08/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney FiledGRANT
01/07/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed
01/06/1997Brief Filed
01/06/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/30/1996Motion to abate appeal disposedDENIED
12/27/1996Response to any order, inquiry or motion
12/18/1996Do not use
12/06/1996Do not use
12/06/1996Do not use
11/12/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/16/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasG. Dwayne Pruitt
Young, Lynn DaleCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
121st District Court
Terry
Honorable Kelly G Moore
4160-A
10 yrs, TDC