judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01373-CR
01-96-01373-CR
11/12/1996
Felony DWI
Reyes, Braulio
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/02/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/26/1999Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
02/03/1999Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
12/10/1998Case file received by higher Court or agency.
12/08/1998Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
11/02/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
10/01/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/01/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/28/1998Submitted
08/28/1998Submission
08/28/1998Submitted
08/05/1998Case set for submission no oral argument
04/01/1998Brief Due
03/26/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/26/1998Case ready to be set
03/26/1998Case ready to be set
03/02/1998Brief Due
03/02/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/05/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/05/1998Order enteredGrant motion
06/24/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/12/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/11/1997Brief Due
03/27/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/18/1997Brief Due
03/18/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/23/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/16/1997Brief Due
12/17/1996Record due
12/17/1996Statement of facts filed
12/13/1996Transcript filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Notice of appeal filed
10/18/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/02/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Alan Curry
REYES, BRAULIOCriminal - AppellantDiana Olvera
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
726207
3 Yrs. TDC