judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00632-CR
03-96-00632-CR
11/12/1996
Habeas corpus appeal
Ex Parte: Charles Eugene Martell
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
10/02/1997Mandate Issued
09/09/1997Record Returned from Higher Court
08/29/1997Petition for discretionary review refused
05/20/1997Case forwarded to higher court
05/15/1997Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
04/24/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/02/1997list of additional authorities
04/02/1997Submitted
04/02/1997Submission
03/12/1997Oral argument acknowledged
03/04/1997Submission
01/16/1997Brief filed
01/16/1997Case ready to be set
01/06/1997Brief filed
12/12/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/02/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/14/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Marcos Hernandez Jr.
Mr. Michael Wenk
Martell, Charles Eugene H/p:AppellantMr. George A. Scharmen
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Hays
Honorable Charles R. Ramsay
CR-95-271