judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00517-CR
02-96-00517-CR
11/12/1996
Robbery
Lara, David James
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/02/1998Mandate Issued
12/18/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/09/1997Submitted
12/09/1997Submission
11/18/1997Submission
11/18/1997Letter
10/03/1997Brief Filed
10/03/1997Case ready to be set
10/02/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/29/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/02/1997Brief Filed
06/02/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/21/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/08/1997Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
03/03/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/22/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/12/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/02/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lara, David JamesCriminal - AppellantDouglas T. Emerson
J. Rex Barnett
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
0595836D
Ct1: 12 yrs IDTDCJ