judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAINE (LEONARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33481
Short Caption:CRAINE (LEONARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33264
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C93664Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/20/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00407
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00324
05/20/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on 5/18/99. 99-04162
05/20/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/21/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand for Hearing on Actual Innocence. 99-13000
10/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. Order Administratively Closing Docket No. 33481 and Remanding Docket No. 33264. fn1[The appeals were inadvertently docketed in this court as separate proceedings in Docket Nos. 33264 and 33481. Because the appeals both challenge the same district court order, we direct the clerk of this court to close the appeal in Docket No. 33481 administratively.] The office of the Federal Public Defender has now filed a motion requesting this court to remand this appeal to the district court for an evidentiary heearing to establish appellant's actual innocence. We have carefully reviewed the record, the pending motion, the documentation attached thereto, and the State's response. fn3[We grant the State's motion to file an untimely response to the motion for a remand. The clerk of this court shall file the response provisionally submitted by the State.] We grant the motion, and " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings on appellant's claim." This order constitutes our final resolution of this appeal; any further appellate proceedings in this matter shall be docketed in this court as new and separate matters. SNP00A-WM/ML/NB. Nos. 33264, 33481. 00-18015
10/11/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.