judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHANNON BLAKELY v. BRANDON BLAKELY

Case Heading (S-09-0020)
Case Number:S-09-0020Case Docketed On:01/27/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:SHANNON BLAKELY v. BRANDON BLAKELY
Full Title:SHANNON BLAKELY, Appellant (Plainitff), v. BRANDON BLAKELY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShannon BlakelyChristopher Michael Wages
AppelleeBrandon BlakelyRichard Allen Erb Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 127
Citation:218 P.3d 253

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/27/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/27/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/13/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/19/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/20/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/05/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/12/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal