judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THEODORE HOLMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1488
Short Caption:THEODORE HOLMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-23230-09Filed Date:11/26/2010

Opening Event Date:11/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/27/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheodore Holmes YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Fucetola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Deitch, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Deitch, Esquire
01/20/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 8, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/16/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 20, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 15 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of itme, and it appearing that the document has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time w/in which to do so. (ETW)
02/25/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
02/25/2011RECEIVED - statement regarding transcript
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
03/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/Hawkins) 9/9/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (32 pgs/Hawkins) 9/13/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (33-218 pgs/Hawkins) 9/14/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (219-405 pgs/Hawkins) 9/15/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (406-529 pgs/Hawkins) 9/16/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (530-652 pgs/Hawkins) 9/17/10 proc.
03/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11 pgs/tape) 11/16/10 proc. w/cd
03/09/2011RECORD INDEX
03/09/2011RECORD COPIES
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/31/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Atty Deitch, 1627 Eye St., NW 20006
03/31/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
04/21/2011ORDERED that the motion of counsel for appellant is granted and the appointment of David B. Deich, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Lisa Chanel, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. David B. Deitch, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. 30 (f), shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order, and appellee'd brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
06/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
06/15/2011APPENDIX
07/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/18/2011FiledBriefing Completed
07/27/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledSubmitted To Fisher,Thompson,Farrell
04/25/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
05/08/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
05/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing Other (Appellant)Granted
05/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion, and appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed on or before 6/25/12.
06/27/2012FiledORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
06/27/2012FiledMandate