judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00310-CV
02-96-00310-CV
11/12/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Department of Public Safety
Bond, Billy Vance
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/04/1998Mandate Issued
10/23/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/21/1997Submitted
05/21/1997Submission
03/21/1997Brief Filed
03/21/1997Case ready to be set
01/21/1997Brief Filed
11/26/1996Response Filed
11/22/1996Response Filed
11/22/1996Submission
11/21/1996Letter
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department Of Public SafetyAppellantPhyllis Waldrep Cranz
Bond, Billy VanceAppelleeJim J. Hatcher
Trial Court Information
235th District Court
Cooke
Honorable Jerry W. Woodlock
96-357