judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00305-CV
02-96-00305-CV
11/12/1996
Other Personal Injury
Brown, Trenton M.
Mackey, George B.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/21/1997Mandate Issued
01/30/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
01/29/1997Submitted
01/29/1997Submission
12/16/1996Letter
11/19/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/12/1996Appeal/Writ with Pro Se Party
11/12/1996Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mackey, George B.AppelleeGeorge B. Mackey
Brown, Trenton M.AppellantTrenton M. Brown
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Bob S. McGrath
342-156532-94