judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01374-CR
01-96-01374-CR
11/12/1996
Aggravated Robbery
Daniels, Darby Nathaniel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1999Correspondence
09/04/1999Correspondence
09/02/1999Inmate or indigent appellant sent a copy of record
08/18/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/18/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/02/1999Motion to obtain record disposedGrant motion
07/02/1999Order enteredGrant motion
07/01/1999Petition for discretionary review due
06/28/1999Motion to obtain record (generally pro se)
06/07/1999Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals.Grant motion
06/01/1999Extension of time to file PDR filed in Court of Criminal Appeals.
03/19/1999Motion for Rehearing Due
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1998Submitted
11/17/1998Submission
11/17/1998Submitted
10/08/1998Submission
07/17/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/17/1998Case ready to be set
07/17/1998Extension to file brief disposed-brief hereGrant motion
07/17/1998Case ready to be set
07/09/1998Brief received only-oral argument waived
07/09/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/15/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/28/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/14/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/04/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/25/1998Brief Due
03/26/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/26/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/19/1998Brief received only-oral argument waived
03/19/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/09/1998Order entered
11/20/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/04/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/21/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/14/1997Brief Due
06/26/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/18/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/22/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/01/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
04/01/1997Statement of facts filed
03/11/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/28/1997Statement of Facts Due
02/25/1997Motion to withdraw as counsel disposed - no new attorney to substitute in as counselGrant motion
01/23/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/16/1997Motion to withdraw as counsel filed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel
01/06/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/02/1997Motion to withdraw and substitute attorney disposedGrant motion
12/22/1996Record due
12/19/1996Transcript filed
12/16/1996Motion to substitute counsel
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Notice of appeal filed
10/23/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/18/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Sharon Elaine Rock
DANIELS, DARBY NATHANIELCriminal - AppellantDionne Susan Press
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable H. LON HARPER
728606
40 Yrs. TDC